CO HB1017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a bill of rights for youth in foster care.
Title
Bill of Rights for Foster Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-02-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/09/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-01-30 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-01-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-01-24 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |