CO HB1006 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fifth-day school week supplemental enrichment programs.
Title
Fifth-day School Enrichment Programs Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-20 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2021-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |