CA SJR7 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 13).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. and the FBI surveillance tapes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.: FBI surveillance tapes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Bradford et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 13).
2022-01-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-08-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-08-19SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2071.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 1932.) (July 13).
2021-07-09SenateSet for hearing July 13.
2021-07-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-30SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback