CA SB944 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11011.6 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Surplus state property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB944 Torres Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 944 Torres Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Special Consent #13 SB944 Torres (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 944 Torres Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Special Consent #13 SB944 Torres (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 4872.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 6417.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to L. Gov.) suspended. (Page 5488.) |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and L. GOV. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3418.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3091.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11011.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11011.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11011.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |