CA SB891 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15490 of the Government Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: construction: ombudsman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-26 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 851.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17070.32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15490 | Amended Code | Citation Text |