CA SB878 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 689, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 689, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12301.24 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
In-home supportive services: onsite provider orientation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 3 SB878 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 878 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 878 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By SKINNER Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB878 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 878 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 878 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By SKINNER Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB878 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 689, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4987.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6712.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.) |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6333.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 14). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3137.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |