CA SB790 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7928.801 to the Government Code, relating to public records.
Title
Public records: contracts for goods and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - SB 790 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB790 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB790 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-06-28 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2427.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 962.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 688.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7928.801 | New Code | See Bill Text |