CA SB771 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14005.27 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: foster children: eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB771 ALQUIST (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB771 ALQUIST (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.) | |
2010-07-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-11 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-01-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-01-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2733.) To Assembly. | |
2010-01-26 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-01-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2694.) | |
2010-01-20 | Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-01-15 | Set for hearing January 19. | |
2010-01-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 2673.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-01-06 | Set for hearing January 13. | |
2009-12-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |