CA SB599 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22850 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Employees’ Medical and Hospital Care Act: Peace Officers Research Association of California Insurance and Benefits Trust.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SB599 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 599 Portantino Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB599 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2017-10-15 Vetoed by the Governor.
2017-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-05SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2480.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2846.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-08-21AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
2017-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 830.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code20404Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22850Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback