CA SB586 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 429, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 429, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13510.8 of the Penal Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Peace officers: certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 586 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB586 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Assembly - SB 586 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber Amend By WEBER, A. Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB586 Bradford et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB586 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Assembly - SB 586 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber Amend By WEBER, A. Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB586 Bradford et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 429, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2634.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 3133.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 2788.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1382.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1197.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13510.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |