CA SB506 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-04 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-04 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1618 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Department of Fish and Wildlife: lake or streambed alteration agreements: Internet Web site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB506 Nielsen et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 506 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB506 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 506 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB506 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-04 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-07-21 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-07-21 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1933.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 512.) (March 28). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 1618 | New Code | See Bill Text |