CA SB474 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 5005 of the Penal Code, relating to prisons.
Title
Canteens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB474 Becker et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 474 Becker Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB474 Becker et al (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 474 Becker Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB474 Becker et al (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 5. Page 2843.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3431.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1171.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 579.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 5005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |