CA SB328 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 46148 to the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance.
Title
Pupil attendance: school start time.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Assembly - SB 328 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB328 Portantino et al (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB328 Portantino et al (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 20. Page 3580.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 1188.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1096.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 796.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46148 | New Code | See Bill Text |