CA SB296 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 575, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 575, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1368.015 of, and to add Sections 1367.29 and 1368.016 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 10123.198 and 10123.199 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB296 Lowenthal (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - SB 296 Lowenthal Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB296 Lowenthal (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - SB 296 Lowenthal Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB296 Lowenthal (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 575, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m. | |
2009-09-02 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 2118.) To enrollment. | |
2009-08-27 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2763.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-08-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-14 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-06-30 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-28 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 889.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-04-24 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 637.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 22. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-26 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |