CA SB1489 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 68151 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 1417.1 of the Penal Code, relating to courts.
Title
Courts: management and destruction of trial court
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Harman [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1489 Harman Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1489 Harman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 SB1489 Harman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1489 Harman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 SB1489 Harman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-23 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 4761.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-16 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5970.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3667.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-23 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (April 24). | |
2012-03-30 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 68151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1417.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |