CA SB1445 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2f (commencing with Section 3000) to Title 14 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, and to add Sections 312.6 and 312.7 to, and to add Article 1.01 (commencing with Section 11745) to Chapter 4 of Division 5 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Electric mobility manufacturers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 312.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 312.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1445 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1445 |