CA SB1419 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 15 (commencing with Section 49030) of Division 17 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Food Desert Elimination Grant Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Marie Alvarado-Gil [D] | Sen. Angelique Ashby [D] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] | Sen. Aisha Wahab [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1419 Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1419 Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4183.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3983.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3629.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in REV. & TAX. pending receipt. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI and REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 49030 | New Code | See Bill Text |