CA SB1419 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13945 to the Government Code, relating to the State Board of Equalization.
Title
State Board of Equalization: discharge from
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-14 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3305.) (April 25). | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13943.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13945 | New Code | See Bill Text |