CA SB1381 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - April 20 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - April 20 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5019 of the Education Code, relating to elections.
Title
School districts and community college districts: governing board elections: charter cities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | April 20 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | April 6 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 5019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |