CA SB1355 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Claims against the state: appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 1355 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Holden (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1355 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1355 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5626.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3702.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3650.) (May 9). |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |