CA SB1346 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 14422 of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Election day procedures: ballot containers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 8. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-04-30 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-18 | Set for hearing May 1. | |
2012-04-17 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-03-29 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 14422 | New Code | See Bill Text |