CA SB1335 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 34171, 34177, and 34180 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to redevelopment.
Title
Redevelopment: brownfield sites.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-14 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3305.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2012-04-18 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3190.) (April 16). | |
2012-03-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 16. | |
2012-03-14 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and GOV. & F. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34177.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |