CA SB1316 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 46141 of, and to add Section 46146.5 to, the Education Code, relating to school attendance.
Title
School attendance: early and middle college high schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Assembly - SB 1316 Hancock Senate Third Reading By CARTER (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1316 Hancock (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1316 Hancock (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-06-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-06-25 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5420.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-15 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3403.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-01 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3034.) (March 28). | |
2012-03-16 | Set for hearing March 28. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46146.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |