CA SB1264 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5899.4 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to the Property Assessed Clean Energy program.
Title
Property Assessed Clean Energy program: wildfire safety improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 5899.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |