CA SB1253 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19418 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Article 3.6 (commencing with Section 4165) to Chapter 6 of Part 3 of Division 3 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to district agricultural associations.
Title
28th District Agricultural Association: joint powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1253 Runner By Fuller (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1253 Runner By Fuller (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-05-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 3398.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3188.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-27 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19418 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 4165 | New Code | See Bill Text |