CA SB1164 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 678.3 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Assembly - SB 1164 Emmerson Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1164 Emmerson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1164 Emmerson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2012-06-27 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5482.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-21 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |
2012-05-25 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-05-10 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3470.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1). | |
2012-04-24 | Set for hearing May 1. | |
2012-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 678.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |