CA SB1162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8162.7 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Capitol area planning: height limits.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1162 Pan Senate Third Reading By MCCARTY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1162 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1162 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6475.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5090.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4785.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8162.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42705.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |