CA SB1137 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 41850.5 to the Education Code, relating to school transportation.
Title
School transportation: apportionments.
Sponsors
Sen. Norma Torres [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Asm. Connie Conway [R] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1137 Torres (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1137 Torres (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3697.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3710.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3118.) (April 9). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41850.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |