CA SB1072 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19605.73 of, to add Sections 19601.02, 19605.74, and 19642.1 to, and to add Article 9.1 (commencing with Section 19604.5) to Chapter 4 of Division 8 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
Horse racing: statewide marketing organization:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB1072 Calderon (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1072 Calderon Senate Third Reading By MA (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1072 Calderon Senate Third Reading Amend By TORRICO Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1072 Calderon (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1072 Calderon Senate Third Reading By MA (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1072 Calderon Senate Third Reading Amend By TORRICO Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1072 Calderon (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-31 | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 5130.) Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 6. Page 5107.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-31 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. Withdrawn from committee. To unfinished business. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5075.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-08-30 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-30 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. Consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 10. Page 6871.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-30 | Re-referred to Com. On APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6818.) From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on August 30.) Joint Rule 62(a) and Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6818.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes | |
2010-08-23 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6437.) To third reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-13 | Set, first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-07-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2010-06-23 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-20 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2010-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3412.) To Assembly. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3357.) | |
2010-03-10 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2010-02-18 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |