CA SB1068 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 220, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 220, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 20311 of the Public Contract Code, and to repeal and add Section 102222 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Local Agency Public Construction Act: Golden Empire
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1068 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 SB1068 Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 SB1068 Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 220, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-16 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5966.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3667.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-23 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-05-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (April 30). | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3210.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-03-22 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-21 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-02 | Set for hearing March 27. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-02-14 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102222 | New Code | See Bill Text |