CA SB1049 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1269c and 1270.1 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Bail.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Harman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-05 - Assembly - SB 1049 Harman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1049 Harman (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1049 Harman (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-08-23 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-08-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2010-08-05 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-05 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6054.) To Senate. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30). | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |
2010-06-03 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-05-24 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-24 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 3584.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-05-05 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-05-03 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 3308.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-03-17 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-17 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |