CA AJR43 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California shellfish.
Title
California shellfish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR43 Chesbro By Monning (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - AJR 43 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - AJR 43 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4416.) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5623.) |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |