CA AJR4 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Basel Convention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Basel Convention: ratification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR4 Cristina Garcia et a By Stern (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - AJR 4 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2021.
2021-07-15 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2021-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-07-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0.)
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
2021-04-28SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-04-06SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-04-05AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 861.)
2021-04-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 24).
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-01-13AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-01-12AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback