CA AJR4 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Berryessa Snow Mountain National Monument.
Title
Berryessa Snow Mountain National Monument.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR4 Dodd By Wolk (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Assembly - AJR4 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Assembly - AJR4 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 484.) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 24). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 322.) |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (February 10). |
2015-02-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Amended. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |