CA ACR147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-18-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-10 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-10 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Aerospace Valley.
Title
The Aerospace Valley.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Assembly - ACR 147 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.) |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Amended. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |