CA ACR114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 150th birthday of Mahatma Gandhi.
Title
Mahatma Gandhi: 150th birth anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR114 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - ACR 114 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - ACR 114 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2716.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2815.) |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |