CA AB2748 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 744, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 744, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25217.2, 25507, and 25513 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste: business plans.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Asm. Bonnie Lowenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2748 E.S.& T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By ALEJO (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2748 Committee on E.S. & T.M.(Alejo) By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2748 E.S.& T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2748 Committee on E.S. & T.M.(Alejo) By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2748 E.S.& T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 744, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6482.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4821.). |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5113.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-03-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 6. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25217.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |