CA AB2724 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14094.4, 14094.5, and 14094.6 of, and to add Section 14197.11 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: alternate health care service plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - AB 2724 ARAMBULA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2724 Arambula By Eggman (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2724 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2724 Arambula By Eggman (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2724 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 15.). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 4530.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 18.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4845.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 4844.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 19). |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14094.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14094.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14094.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |