CA AB2589 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17052 and 17052.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to economic relief.
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit: one-time child tax credit payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2589 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |