CA AB2501 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 871, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 871, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116355, 116681, 116682, and 116686 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Drinking water: state administrators: consolidation and extension of service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2501 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2501 Chu et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2501 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2501 Chu et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2501 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 871, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 31). |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6056.). |
2018-08-28 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 28) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5428.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116681 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116682 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116686 | Amended Code | Citation Text |