CA AB2006 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6369.3 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and Use Tax Law: exemption: over-the-counter medication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6369.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |