CA AB1820 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 834, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 834, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12930 of the Government Code, relating to personal rights.
Title
Personal rights: civil liability and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1820 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1820 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1820 JUD (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1820 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1820 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1820 JUD (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1820 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 834, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3471.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.) |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2269.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1880.). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1523.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 6. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |