CA AB1475 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13665 to the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: social media.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-12 - Assembly - AB 1475 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1475 Low By Kamlager (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1475 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1475 Low By Kamlager (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1475 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2306.). |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1867.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1718.) (June 29). |
2021-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1329.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1250.) |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13665 | New Code | See Bill Text |