CA AB1104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76000.10 of the Government Code, and to add Section 14124.15 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to air ambulance services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Air ambulance services.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1104 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1104 Grayson By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1104 Grayson Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1104 Grayson By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1104 Grayson Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2743.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2296.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1784.). |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 76000.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |