CA AB1104 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 18320 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The California Political Cyberfraud Abatement Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1104 Chau By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1104 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2701.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD., E. & C.A. and APPR.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 1887.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 10).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and E. & R.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code18320Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code18320.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback