AZ SB1697 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; bicycle paths; walkways; prohibition
Title
Highways; bicycle paths; walkways; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Bicycle Paths
Federal Monies
Highways
Limitations
Prohibition
Transportation - Title 28
Transportation Planning
Walkways
Federal Monies
Highways
Limitations
Prohibition
Transportation - Title 28
Transportation Planning
Walkways
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |