AZ SB1624 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unauthorized disclosure; intimate images; remedies
Title
Unauthorized disclosure; intimate images; remedies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 118 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-31 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2022-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Action
Confidential Information Form
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Exceptions
Individual Persons
Intimate Images
Proceedings
Remedies
Statute Of Limitations
Unauthorized Disclosure
Confidential Information Form
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Exceptions
Individual Persons
Intimate Images
Proceedings
Remedies
Statute Of Limitations
Unauthorized Disclosure