AZ SB1612 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Aggressive solicitation; sign requirement
Title
Aggressive solicitation; sign requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Aggressive Solicitation
Classification
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Offenses Against Public Order
Sign Requirement
Classification
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Offenses Against Public Order
Sign Requirement