AZ SB1609 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health; AHCCCS; health facilities
Title
Behavioral health; AHCCCS; health facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | Chapter 200 |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-1-4-0) |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs (see Also: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System)
Annual Report
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Behavioral Health
Discharge
Documentation
Duplicative Paperwork Requirements
Health Facilities
Medications
Oversight
Patients With Serious Mental Illness
Peer Specialists
Personal Health Information
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Qualifications
Report
Strike Everything Amendment
Study
Training
Transfer
Annual Report
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Behavioral Health
Discharge
Documentation
Duplicative Paperwork Requirements
Health Facilities
Medications
Oversight
Patients With Serious Mental Illness
Peer Specialists
Personal Health Information
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Qualifications
Report
Strike Everything Amendment
Study
Training
Transfer
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2903.14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2903.15 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2903.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |