AZ SB1593 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Teachers; braille literacy; rules
Title
Teachers; braille literacy; rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |